Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB931 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murphy (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 931
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 5, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an individual's eligibility to receive unemployment
 compensation benefits on the individual's waiting period claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 207.021(c), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, an
 individual is eligible to receive benefits on the individual's
 waiting period claim in accordance with this subtitle if the
 individual [who] has been paid benefits in the individual's current
 benefit year equal to or exceeding two [three] times the
 individual's benefit amount and:
 (1)   has returned to full-time employment after being
 totally or partially unemployed for at least seven consecutive
 days; or
 (2)  has exhausted the individual's regular benefits
 for the current benefit year, other than benefits applicable to the
 waiting period [is eligible to receive benefits on the individual's
 waiting period claim in accordance with this subtitle].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim for unemployment compensation benefits filed with the
 Texas Workforce Commission on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A claim filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the claim was filed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *