1 | 1 | | By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 950 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 26, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | 5 | | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 26, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the review of groundwater conservation districts by the |
---|
12 | 12 | | state auditor. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 35.018(b), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
15 | 15 | | read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) The report must include: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) the names and locations of all priority |
---|
18 | 18 | | groundwater management areas and districts created or attempted to |
---|
19 | 19 | | be created on or after November 5, 1985, the effective date of |
---|
20 | 20 | | Chapter 133 (H.B. No. 2), Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular |
---|
21 | 21 | | Session, 1985; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) the authority under which each priority |
---|
23 | 23 | | groundwater management area and district was proposed for creation; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) a detailed analysis of each election held to |
---|
25 | 25 | | confirm the creation of a district, including analysis of election |
---|
26 | 26 | | results, possible reasons for the success or failure to confirm the |
---|
27 | 27 | | creation of a district, and the possibility for future voter |
---|
28 | 28 | | approval of districts in areas in which attempts to create |
---|
29 | 29 | | districts failed; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (4) a detailed analysis of the activities of each |
---|
31 | 31 | | district created, including those districts which are implementing |
---|
32 | 32 | | management plans certified under Section 36.1072; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (5) a report on [audits performed on districts under |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 36.302 and] remedial actions taken under Section 36.303; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (6) recommendations for changes in this chapter and |
---|
36 | 36 | | Chapter 36 that will facilitate the creation of priority |
---|
37 | 37 | | groundwater management areas and the creation and operation of |
---|
38 | 38 | | districts; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (7) a report on educational efforts in newly |
---|
40 | 40 | | designated priority groundwater management areas; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (8) any other information and recommendations that the |
---|
42 | 42 | | commission considers relevant. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 2. Section 36.061(b), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
44 | 44 | | read as follows: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) The state auditor may conduct a financial audit [the |
---|
46 | 46 | | records] of any district if the state auditor determines that the |
---|
47 | 47 | | audit is necessary. |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 3. Section 36.1072(f), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
49 | 49 | | read as follows: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (f) If the executive administrator does not approve the |
---|
51 | 51 | | district's management plan, the executive administrator shall |
---|
52 | 52 | | provide to the district, in writing, the reasons for the |
---|
53 | 53 | | action. Not later than the 180th day after the date a district |
---|
54 | 54 | | receives notice that its management plan has not been approved, the |
---|
55 | 55 | | district may submit a revised management plan for review and |
---|
56 | 56 | | approval. The executive administrator's decision may be appealed |
---|
57 | 57 | | to the development board. If the development board decides not to |
---|
58 | 58 | | approve the district's management plan on appeal, the district may |
---|
59 | 59 | | request that the conflict be mediated. The district and the board |
---|
60 | 60 | | may seek the assistance of the Center for Public Policy Dispute |
---|
61 | 61 | | Resolution at The University of Texas School of Law or an |
---|
62 | 62 | | alternative dispute resolution system established under Chapter |
---|
63 | 63 | | 152, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, in obtaining a qualified |
---|
64 | 64 | | impartial third party to mediate the conflict. The cost of the |
---|
65 | 65 | | mediation services must be specified in the agreement between the |
---|
66 | 66 | | parties and the Center for Public Policy Dispute Resolution or the |
---|
67 | 67 | | alternative dispute resolution system. If the parties do not |
---|
68 | 68 | | resolve the conflict through mediation, the decision of the |
---|
69 | 69 | | development board not to approve the district's management plan may |
---|
70 | 70 | | be appealed to a district court in Travis County. Costs for the |
---|
71 | 71 | | appeal shall be set by the court hearing the appeal. An appeal |
---|
72 | 72 | | under this subsection is by trial de novo. The commission shall |
---|
73 | 73 | | not take enforcement action against a district under Subchapter I |
---|
74 | 74 | | until the latest of the expiration of the 180-day period, the date |
---|
75 | 75 | | the development board has taken final action withholding approval |
---|
76 | 76 | | of a revised management plan, the date the mediation is completed, |
---|
77 | 77 | | or the date a final judgment upholding the board's decision is |
---|
78 | 78 | | entered by a district court. An enforcement action may not be |
---|
79 | 79 | | taken against a district by the commission [or the state auditor] |
---|
80 | 80 | | under Subchapter I because the district's management plan and the |
---|
81 | 81 | | approved regional water plan are in conflict while the parties are |
---|
82 | 82 | | attempting to resolve the conflict before the development board, in |
---|
83 | 83 | | mediation, or in court. Rules of the district continue in full |
---|
84 | 84 | | force and effect until all appeals under this subsection have been |
---|
85 | 85 | | exhausted and the final judgment is adverse to the district. |
---|
86 | 86 | | SECTION 4. Section 36.303(a), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
87 | 87 | | read as follows: |
---|
88 | 88 | | (a) If Section [36.108,] 36.301 or 36.3011[, or 36.302(f)] |
---|
89 | 89 | | applies, the commission, after notice and hearing in accordance |
---|
90 | 90 | | with Chapter 2001, Government Code, shall take action the |
---|
91 | 91 | | commission considers appropriate, including: |
---|
92 | 92 | | (1) issuing an order requiring the district to take |
---|
93 | 93 | | certain actions or to refrain from taking certain actions; |
---|
94 | 94 | | (2) dissolving the board in accordance with Sections |
---|
95 | 95 | | 36.305 and 36.307 and calling an election for the purpose of |
---|
96 | 96 | | electing a new board; |
---|
97 | 97 | | (3) requesting the attorney general to bring suit for |
---|
98 | 98 | | the appointment of a receiver to collect the assets and carry on the |
---|
99 | 99 | | business of the groundwater conservation district; or |
---|
100 | 100 | | (4) dissolving the district in accordance with |
---|
101 | 101 | | Sections 36.304, 36.305, and 36.308. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 5. Section 36.302, Water Code, is repealed. |
---|
103 | 103 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
104 | 104 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
105 | 105 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
106 | 106 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
107 | 107 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
108 | 108 | | * * * * * |
---|