Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB950 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 950
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 26, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 26, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the review of groundwater conservation districts by the
 state auditor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 35.018(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The report must include:
 (1)  the names and locations of all priority
 groundwater management areas and districts created or attempted to
 be created on or after November 5, 1985, the effective date of
 Chapter 133 (H.B. No. 2), Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 1985;
 (2)  the authority under which each priority
 groundwater management area and district was proposed for creation;
 (3)  a detailed analysis of each election held to
 confirm the creation of a district, including analysis of election
 results, possible reasons for the success or failure to confirm the
 creation of a district, and the possibility for future voter
 approval of districts in areas in which attempts to create
 districts failed;
 (4)  a detailed analysis of the activities of each
 district created, including those districts which are implementing
 management plans certified under Section 36.1072;
 (5)  a report on [audits performed on districts under
 Section 36.302 and] remedial actions taken under Section 36.303;
 (6)  recommendations for changes in this chapter and
 Chapter 36 that will facilitate the creation of priority
 groundwater management areas and the creation and operation of
 districts;
 (7)  a report on educational efforts in newly
 designated priority groundwater management areas; and
 (8)  any other information and recommendations that the
 commission considers relevant.
 SECTION 2.  Section 36.061(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The state auditor may conduct a financial audit [the
 records] of any district if the state auditor determines that the
 audit is necessary.
 SECTION 3.  Section 36.1072(f), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  If the executive administrator does not approve the
 district's management plan, the executive administrator shall
 provide to the district, in writing, the reasons for the
 action.  Not later than the 180th day after the date a district
 receives notice that its management plan has not been approved, the
 district may submit a revised management plan for review and
 approval.  The executive administrator's decision may be appealed
 to the development board.  If the development board decides not to
 approve the district's management plan on appeal, the district may
 request that the conflict be mediated.  The district and the board
 may seek the assistance of the Center for Public Policy Dispute
 Resolution at The University of Texas School of Law or an
 alternative dispute resolution system established under Chapter
 152, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, in obtaining a qualified
 impartial third party to mediate the conflict.  The cost of the
 mediation services must be specified in the agreement between the
 parties and the Center for Public Policy Dispute Resolution or the
 alternative dispute resolution system.  If the parties do not
 resolve the conflict through mediation, the decision of the
 development board not to approve the district's management plan may
 be appealed to a district court in Travis County.  Costs for the
 appeal shall be set by the court hearing the appeal.  An appeal
 under this subsection is by trial de novo.  The commission shall
 not take enforcement action against a district under Subchapter I
 until the latest of the expiration of the 180-day period, the date
 the development board has taken final action withholding approval
 of a revised management plan, the date the mediation is completed,
 or the date a final judgment upholding the board's decision is
 entered by a district court.  An enforcement action may not be
 taken against a district by the commission [or the state auditor]
 under Subchapter I because the district's management plan and the
 approved regional water plan are in conflict while the parties are
 attempting to resolve the conflict before the development board, in
 mediation, or in court.  Rules of the district continue in full
 force and effect until all appeals under this subsection have been
 exhausted and the final judgment is adverse to the district.
 SECTION 4.  Section 36.303(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If Section [36.108,] 36.301 or 36.3011[, or 36.302(f)]
 applies, the commission, after notice and hearing in accordance
 with Chapter 2001, Government Code, shall take action the
 commission considers appropriate, including:
 (1)  issuing an order requiring the district to take
 certain actions or to refrain from taking certain actions;
 (2)  dissolving the board in accordance with Sections
 36.305 and 36.307 and calling an election for the purpose of
 electing a new board;
 (3)  requesting the attorney general to bring suit for
 the appointment of a receiver to collect the assets and carry on the
 business of the groundwater conservation district; or
 (4)  dissolving the district in accordance with
 Sections 36.304, 36.305, and 36.308.
 SECTION 5.  Section 36.302, Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *