Senate | 05/25/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2839 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2838 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2838 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2838 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2817 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2817 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 949 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |