House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1390 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Filed |