E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4930
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4931
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1601
|
Journal Page: 4931
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4930
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4757
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#626
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Reynolds
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Amended
|
1-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2519
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/5/15 2:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 2503
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2503
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#580
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2431
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Pensions
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
House
|
01/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|