LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB966
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB966
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB966
Compare Versions
HB966 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB966 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB966 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB966 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB966 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB966 Comm Sub April 2, 2015
HB966 Introduced January 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB966 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB966 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB966 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB966 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB966 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB966 Comm Sub April 2, 2015
HB966 Introduced January 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare