Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB978 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Price, Springer (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 978
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the Route 66 Historic Corridor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 442, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 442.030 to read as follows:
 Sec. 442.030.  ROUTE 66 HISTORIC CORRIDOR.  (a)  The
 commission shall identify relevant segments of former U.S. Highway
 66 located in this state that are still in use and designate those
 segments as a historic corridor.
 (b)  The historic corridor designated by the commission
 shall be known as the Route 66 Historic Corridor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *