E | 03/27/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1063 | |
E | 03/24/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 552 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 983 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/20/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 318 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |