Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 2, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 1, 2015