E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5571 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4978 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2438 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2438 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2438 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2438 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2826 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#755 | Journal Page: 2826 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2826 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2826 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Filed |