Senate | 05/25/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1116 | Journal Page: 3566 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3566 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3566 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2650 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Filed |