E | 06/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 06/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6047 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3626 | |
House | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6045 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6047 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5696 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 3591 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3495 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5596 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5596 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Filed |