E | 02/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 250 | |
E | 02/03/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 174 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 212 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 213 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 199 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 97 | |
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 46 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 189 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 189 | |
House | 01/20/2015 | Filed |