Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR44 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R6256 BPG-D
 By: Miller of Comal H.C.R. No. 44


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, United States Army Sergeant Gilberto Lopez Sanchez
 of New Braunfels made the ultimate sacrifice in behalf of his
 country during the Korean War, in the ferocious Battle of the Chosin
 Reservoir; and
 WHEREAS, One of eight brothers to serve in the United States
 military, Sergeant Sanchez was born to Bernardino and Coleta
 Sanchez in Comal County on October 21, 1931; trained as an army
 medic, he was assigned to the Medical Company, 32nd Infantry
 Regiment, 7th Infantry Division, which was deployed east of the
 Chosin Reservoir in November 1950 as part of the 31st Regimental
 Combat Team; on the night of November 27-28, 1950, RCT-31, known
 historically as Task Force Faith, was attacked by vastly larger
 numbers of enemy forces; the fighting continued for some two weeks,
 with the task force suffering grievous losses; on December 2, 1950,
 Sergeant Sanchez, who had been treating the wounded, was reported
 as missing in action, and on December 31, 1953, he was listed as
 presumed dead; and
 WHEREAS, Through the years, the family of Sergeant Sanchez
 continued to search for information as to his fate; his remains have
 now been recovered and have been identified through DNA, and he is
 being laid to rest with full military honors on January 23, 2015, at
 Fort Sam Houston National Cemetery; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Sanchez was the recipient of the Purple
 Heart, the National Defense Service Medal, the Korean Service
 Medal, the United Nations Service Medal, the Korean Presidential
 Unit Citation, and the Republic of Korea War Service Medal; he was
 also awarded the Combat Medical Badge; and
 WHEREAS, Unwavering in his devotion to duty, honor, and this
 country, Sergeant Gilberto Sanchez embodied the highest ideals of
 the United States armed forces, and his fellow citizens mourn the
 death of a courageous soldier and patriot whose life was a blessing
 to all who were privileged to share in his love and friendship; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the memory of U.S. Army Sergeant Gilberto Sanchez and
 extend to his family sincere sympathy for his loss and profound
 gratitude for his valiant service; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory
 of U.S. Army Sergeant Gilberto Lopez Sanchez.