Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR44 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 44


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, United States Army Sergeant Gilberto Lopez Sanchez
 of New Braunfels made the ultimate sacrifice in behalf of his
 country during the Korean War, in the ferocious Battle of the Chosin
 Reservoir; and
 WHEREAS, One of eight brothers to serve in the United States
 military, Sergeant Sanchez was born to Bernardino and Coleta
 Sanchez in Comal County on October 21, 1931; trained as an army
 medic, he was assigned to the Medical Company, 32nd Infantry
 Regiment, 7th Infantry Division, which was deployed east of the
 Chosin Reservoir in November 1950 as part of the 31st Regimental
 Combat Team; on the night of November 27-28, 1950, RCT-31, known
 historically as Task Force Faith, was attacked by vastly larger
 numbers of enemy forces; the fighting continued for some two weeks,
 with the task force suffering grievous losses; on December 2, 1950,
 Sergeant Sanchez, who had been treating the wounded, was reported
 as missing in action, and on December 31, 1953, he was listed as
 presumed dead; and
 WHEREAS, Through the years, the family of Sergeant Sanchez
 continued to search for information as to his fate; his remains have
 now been recovered and have been identified through DNA, and he is
 being laid to rest with full military honors on January 23, 2015, at
 Fort Sam Houston National Cemetery; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Sanchez was the recipient of the Purple
 Heart, the National Defense Service Medal, the Korean Service
 Medal, the United Nations Service Medal, the Korean Presidential
 Unit Citation, and the Republic of Korea War Service Medal; he was
 also awarded the Combat Medical Badge; and
 WHEREAS, Unwavering in his devotion to duty, honor, and this
 country, Sergeant Gilberto Sanchez embodied the highest ideals of
 the United States armed forces, and his fellow citizens mourn the
 death of a courageous soldier and patriot whose life was a blessing
 to all who were privileged to share in his love and friendship; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the memory of U.S. Army Sergeant Gilberto Sanchez and
 extend to his family sincere sympathy for his loss and profound
 gratitude for his valiant service; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory
 of U.S. Army Sergeant Gilberto Lopez Sanchez.
 Miller of Comal
 Straus Guerra Otto Straus Guerra Otto
Straus Guerra Otto
 Allen Guillen Paddie Allen Guillen Paddie
Allen Guillen Paddie
 Alonzo Gutierrez Parker Alonzo Gutierrez Parker
Alonzo Gutierrez Parker
 Alvarado Harless Paul Alvarado Harless Paul
Alvarado Harless Paul
 Anchia Hernandez Peña Anchia Hernandez Peña
Anchia Hernandez Peña
 Anderson of Dallas Herrero Phelan Anderson of Dallas Herrero Phelan
Anderson of Dallas Herrero Phelan
 Anderson of McLennan Howard Phillips Anderson of McLennan Howard Phillips
Anderson of McLennan Howard Phillips
 Ashby Huberty Pickett Ashby Huberty Pickett
Ashby Huberty Pickett
 Aycock Hughes Price Aycock Hughes Price
Aycock Hughes Price
 Bell Hunter Raney Bell Hunter Raney
Bell Hunter Raney
 Blanco Isaac Raymond Blanco Isaac Raymond
Blanco Isaac Raymond
 Bohac Israel Reynolds Bohac Israel Reynolds
Bohac Israel Reynolds
 Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Riddle Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Riddle
Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Riddle
 Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rinaldi Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rinaldi
Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rinaldi
 Burkett Keffer Rodriguez of Bexar Burkett Keffer Rodriguez of Bexar
Burkett Keffer Rodriguez of Bexar
 Burns Keough Rodriguez of Travis Burns Keough Rodriguez of Travis
Burns Keough Rodriguez of Travis
 Burrows King of Hemphill Romero, Jr. Burrows King of Hemphill Romero, Jr.
Burrows King of Hemphill Romero, Jr.
 Button King of Parker Rose Button King of Parker Rose
Button King of Parker Rose
 Canales King of Taylor Sanford Canales King of Taylor Sanford
Canales King of Taylor Sanford
 Capriglione King of Uvalde Schaefer Capriglione King of Uvalde Schaefer
Capriglione King of Uvalde Schaefer
 Clardy Klick Schofield Clardy Klick Schofield
Clardy Klick Schofield
 Coleman Koop Shaheen Coleman Koop Shaheen
Coleman Koop Shaheen
 Collier Krause Sheets Collier Krause Sheets
Collier Krause Sheets
 Cook Kuempel Sheffield Cook Kuempel Sheffield
Cook Kuempel Sheffield
 Craddick Landgraf Simmons Craddick Landgraf Simmons
Craddick Landgraf Simmons
 Crownover Larson Simpson Crownover Larson Simpson
Crownover Larson Simpson
 Dale Laubenberg Smith Dale Laubenberg Smith
Dale Laubenberg Smith
 Darby Leach Smithee Darby Leach Smithee
Darby Leach Smithee
 Davis of Dallas Longoria Spitzer Davis of Dallas Longoria Spitzer
Davis of Dallas Longoria Spitzer
 Davis of Harris Lozano Springer Davis of Harris Lozano Springer
Davis of Harris Lozano Springer
 Deshotel Lucio III Stephenson Deshotel Lucio III Stephenson
Deshotel Lucio III Stephenson
 Dukes Márquez Stickland Dukes Márquez Stickland
Dukes Márquez Stickland
 Dutton Martinez Thompson of Brazoria Dutton Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
Dutton Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
 Elkins Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris Elkins Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
Elkins Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
 Faircloth McClendon Tinderholt Faircloth McClendon Tinderholt
Faircloth McClendon Tinderholt
 Fallon Menéndez Turner of Collin Fallon Menéndez Turner of Collin
Fallon Menéndez Turner of Collin
 Farias Metcalf Turner of Harris Farias Metcalf Turner of Harris
Farias Metcalf Turner of Harris
 Farney Meyer Turner of Tarrant Farney Meyer Turner of Tarrant
Farney Meyer Turner of Tarrant
 Farrar Miles VanDeaver Farrar Miles VanDeaver
Farrar Miles VanDeaver
 Fletcher Miller of Comal Villalba Fletcher Miller of Comal Villalba
Fletcher Miller of Comal Villalba
 Flynn Miller of Fort Bend Vo Flynn Miller of Fort Bend Vo
Flynn Miller of Fort Bend Vo
 Frank Moody Walle Frank Moody Walle
Frank Moody Walle
 Frullo Morrison White of Bell Frullo Morrison White of Bell
Frullo Morrison White of Bell
 Galindo Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Galindo Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
Galindo Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
 Geren Murphy Workman Geren Murphy Workman
Geren Murphy Workman
 Giddings Murr Wray Giddings Murr Wray
Giddings Murr Wray
 Goldman Naishtat Wu Goldman Naishtat Wu
Goldman Naishtat Wu
 Gonzales Nevárez Zedler Gonzales Nevárez Zedler
Gonzales Nevárez Zedler
 González Oliveira Zerwas González Oliveira Zerwas
González Oliveira Zerwas
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 44 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on January 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 44 was adopted by the Senate on
 January 26, 2015, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor



Straus Guerra Otto

Allen Guillen Paddie

Alonzo Gutierrez Parker

Alvarado Harless Paul

Anchia Hernandez Peña

Anderson of Dallas Herrero Phelan

Anderson of McLennan Howard Phillips

Ashby Huberty Pickett

Aycock Hughes Price

Bell Hunter Raney

Blanco Isaac Raymond

Bohac Israel Reynolds

Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Riddle

Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rinaldi

Burkett Keffer Rodriguez of Bexar

Burns Keough Rodriguez of Travis

Burrows King of Hemphill Romero, Jr.

Button King of Parker Rose

Canales King of Taylor Sanford

Capriglione King of Uvalde Schaefer

Clardy Klick Schofield

Coleman Koop Shaheen

Collier Krause Sheets

Cook Kuempel Sheffield

Craddick Landgraf Simmons

Crownover Larson Simpson

Dale Laubenberg Smith

Darby Leach Smithee

Davis of Dallas Longoria Spitzer

Davis of Harris Lozano Springer

Deshotel Lucio III Stephenson

Dukes Márquez Stickland

Dutton Martinez Thompson of Brazoria

Elkins Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris

Faircloth McClendon Tinderholt

Fallon Menéndez Turner of Collin

Farias Metcalf Turner of Harris

Farney Meyer Turner of Tarrant

Farrar Miles VanDeaver

Fletcher Miller of Comal Villalba

Flynn Miller of Fort Bend Vo

Frank Moody Walle

Frullo Morrison White of Bell

Galindo Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler

Geren Murphy Workman

Giddings Murr Wray

Goldman Naishtat Wu

Gonzales Nevárez Zedler

González Oliveira Zerwas