E | 04/08/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1472 | |
E | 04/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 642 | |
House | 03/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 549 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 641 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 641 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Filed |