Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#913 | Journal Page: 3124 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3124 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3124 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 891 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Filed |