Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR70 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2015

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 6, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015