E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5213 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4773 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1351 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#588 | Journal Page: 2473 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2473 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2473 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |