Senate | 05/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#390 | Journal Page: 1979 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 1979 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Amended | 1-Simpson | Journal Page: 1979 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1979 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |