Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR111 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-84R23266 JJT-D
2- By: Darby H.J.R. No. 111
3- Substitute the following for H.J.R. No. 111:
4- By: Otto C.S.H.J.R. No. 111
1+By: Darby, Springer, Crownover, Simpson, H.J.R. No. 111
2+ Frank, et al.
53
64
75 A JOINT RESOLUTION
8- proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit using revenues,
6+ pr
7+ oposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit using revenues,
98 other money, or account or fund balances dedicated by law for
109 nondedicated general governmental purposes or for certification of
1110 appropriations for nondedicated purposes or entities.
1211 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1312 SECTION 1. Section 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
1413 amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
1514 (b-1) In making the determinations necessary for the
1615 Comptroller of Public Accounts to endorse the certificate under
1716 Subsection (b) of this section, the Comptroller may not consider
1817 any portion of any revenue of, or money received by, this state, or
1918 any account or fund balance, that by law has been dedicated to a
2019 particular purpose or entity as available for the purpose of
2120 certifying that the amount of appropriations for any other purpose
2221 or entity is within the amount estimated to be available in the
2322 affected funds. The Legislature may not by general law make an
2423 unappropriated balance of a dedicated account or fund available for
2524 general governmental purposes or certification except by expressly
2625 repealing the dedication.
2726 (b-2) In making the determinations necessary for the
2827 Comptroller of Public Accounts to make the biennial estimate of
2928 anticipated revenue under Subsection (a) of this section, the
3029 Comptroller may not consider any portion of any revenue of, or money
3130 received by, this state, or any account or fund balance, that by law
3231 has been dedicated to a particular purpose or entity as available
3332 for appropriation for any other purpose or entity.
3433 SECTION 2. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
3534 adding Section 5 to read as follows:
3635 Sec. 5. Revenue of, or money received by, this state from
3736 one or more particular sources or held in or deposited to an
3837 identified account or fund inside or outside the state treasury the
3938 appropriation or expenditure of which at the time the revenue is
4039 collected or the money is received by the state is dedicated by
4140 general law to one or more particular purposes or for one or more
4241 particular entities may not be appropriated or expended for any
4342 purpose, or to or by any entity, other than a purpose or entity to
4443 which the revenue or money is dedicated unless the legislature
4544 expressly repeals the dedication.
4645 SECTION 3. The following temporary provision is added to
4746 the Texas Constitution:
4847 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
4948 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
5049 Regular Session, 2015, prohibiting using revenues, other money, or
5150 account or fund balances dedicated by law for nondedicated general
5251 governmental purposes or for certification of appropriations for
5352 nondedicated purposes or entities.
5453 (b) Section 49a(b-1), Article III, of this constitution
55- takes effect January 1, 2023, and applies only to the certification
54+ takes effect January 1, 2021, and applies only to the certification
5655 of an appropriation authorized for all or part of a state fiscal
57- year beginning on or after September 1, 2023.
56+ year beginning on or after September 1, 2021.
5857 (c) Section 49a(b-2), Article III, of this constitution
5958 takes effect January 1, 2016, and applies to the biennial estimate
6059 of anticipated revenue made under Section 49a(a) of that article
6160 for all or part of a state fiscal year beginning on or after
6261 September 1, 2016.
6362 (d) Section 5, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
64- effect September 1, 2023, and applies only to appropriations
63+ effect September 1, 2021, and applies only to appropriations
6564 authorized for all or part of, or expenditures during, a state
6665 fiscal year beginning on or after that date.
67- (e) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2024.
66+ (e) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
6867 SECTION 4. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
6968 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
7069 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
7170 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to end fee and other
7271 revenue diversions by prohibiting using certain money dedicated by
7372 law for nondedicated purposes or entities and to prohibit using
7473 that money to certify appropriations for nondedicated purposes or
7574 entities."