Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR114 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R11198 CJC-D
22 By: Capriglione H.J.R. No. 114
33
44
55 A JOINT RESOLUTION
66 proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for
77 which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on
88 motor fuels and lubricants may be used.
99 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
1111 is amended to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation,
1313 allocation, and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
1414 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
1515 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
1616 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
1717 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
1818 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way for and[,] constructing,
1919 maintaining, and policing [such] public roadways, and for the
2020 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
2121 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
2222 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
2323 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
2424 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
2525 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law;
2626 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
2727 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
2828 and,] provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
2929 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
3030 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
3131 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
3232 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained in this section
3333 [herein] shall be construed as authorizing the pledging of the
3434 State's credit for any purpose.
3535 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
3636 the Texas Constitution:
3737 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
3838 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
3939 Regular Session, 2015, to limit the purposes for which revenue from
4040 motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and
4141 lubricants may be used.
4242 (b) The changes to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this
4343 constitution made by the amendment apply only in connection with a
4444 state fiscal biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
4545 (c) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018.
4646 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
4747 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
4848 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
4949 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to limit the purposes
5050 for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on
5151 motor fuels and lubricants may be used."