Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR114 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/09/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R11198 CJC-D
 By: Capriglione H.J.R. No. 114


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for
 which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on
 motor fuels and lubricants may be used.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  Subject to legislative appropriation,
 allocation, and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way for and[,] constructing,
 maintaining, and policing [such] public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law;
 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
 and,] provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained in this section
 [herein] shall be construed as authorizing the pledging of the
 State's credit for any purpose.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, to limit the purposes for which revenue from
 motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and
 lubricants may be used.
 (b)  The changes to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this
 constitution made by the amendment apply only in connection with a
 state fiscal biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to limit the purposes
 for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on
 motor fuels and lubricants may be used."