House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 855 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 855 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 530 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 530 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |