Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR29 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 84R1876 JAM-D
22 By: Pickett, et al. H.J.R. No. 29
33
44
55 A JOINT RESOLUTION
66 proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for
77 which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees, certain motor
88 vehicle-related taxes, and certain revenues received from the
99 federal government may be used.
1010 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, Texas
1212 Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
1313 Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
1414 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
1515 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
1616 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
1717 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
1818 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
1919 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way and [,] constructing and
2020 [,] maintaining[, and policing] such public roadways[, and for the
2121 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
2222 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
2323 and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and road
2424 district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939,
2525 and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of
2626 the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law];
2727 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
2828 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
2929 and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
3030 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
3131 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
3232 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
3333 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
3434 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
3535 purpose.
3636 Sec. 7-b. All revenues received from the federal government
3737 as reimbursement for state expenditures of funds that are
3838 themselves dedicated for acquiring rights-of-way and constructing
3939 and[,] maintaining[, and policing] public roadways are also
4040 constitutionally dedicated and shall be used only for those
4141 purposes.
4242 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
4343 the Texas Constitution:
4444 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
4545 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
4646 Regular Session, 2015, prescribing the purposes for which revenue
4747 from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and
4848 lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal
4949 government may be used.
5050 (b) The amendments to Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of
5151 this constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal
5252 biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
5353 (c) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017.
5454 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
5555 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
5656 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
5757 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prescribing the
5858 purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees,
5959 taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received
6060 from the federal government may be used."