House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1433 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 11/11/2014 | Filed |