Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR53 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R1612 CJC-D
22 By: Metcalf H.J.R. No. 53
33
44
55 A JOINT RESOLUTION
66 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
77 derived from the tax imposed on the sale of motor vehicles to the
88 state highway fund.
99 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
1111 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 7-c. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
1313 section, the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter
1414 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale of a motor
1515 vehicle sold in this state shall be deposited to the credit of the
1616 state highway fund and may be appropriated only:
1717 (1) for a purpose authorized by Section 7-a, Article
1818 VIII, of this constitution; or
1919 (2) to repay the principal and interest on general
2020 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
2121 of this constitution.
2222 (b) Subsection (a) of this section does not apply to any
2323 revenue described by that subsection that, under general law in
2424 effect on January 1, 2015, was required to be deposited to the
2525 credit of a fund outside the general revenue fund from which money
2626 could be appropriated only for a purpose that decreases the rates
2727 of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes imposed to fund public
2828 schools. To the extent general law continues to require the deposit
2929 of that revenue in that manner and limit the appropriation of that
3030 revenue to that purpose, the requirement and limitation prevail
3131 over Subsection (a) of this section.
3232 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
3333 the Texas Constitution:
3434 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
3535 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
3636 Regular Session, 2015, dedicating certain revenue derived from the
3737 tax imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state to the
3838 state highway fund.
3939 (b) The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by
4040 the amendment take effect September 1, 2026.
4141 (c) Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on
4242 September 1, 2026, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue
4343 to which Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies
4444 for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-c(a),
4545 Article VIII, of this constitution.
4646 (d) In each state fiscal year that begins on or after
4747 September 1, 2017, but before September 1, 2026, the legislature
4848 shall decrease in equal increments each year the amount of revenue
4949 to which Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies
5050 that is appropriated for any purpose other than a purpose described
5151 by Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution as necessary
5252 to comply with Subsection (c) of this temporary provision beginning
5353 September 1, 2026.
5454 (e) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2027.
5555 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
5656 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
5757 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
5858 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
5959 revenue derived from the tax imposed on a sale of a motor vehicle
6060 sold in this state to the state highway fund."