84R1612 CJC-D By: Metcalf H.J.R. No. 53 A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale of motor vehicles to the state highway fund. BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by adding Section 7-c to read as follows: Sec. 7-c. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state shall be deposited to the credit of the state highway fund and may be appropriated only: (1) for a purpose authorized by Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this constitution; or (2) to repay the principal and interest on general obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III, of this constitution. (b) Subsection (a) of this section does not apply to any revenue described by that subsection that, under general law in effect on January 1, 2015, was required to be deposited to the credit of a fund outside the general revenue fund from which money could be appropriated only for a purpose that decreases the rates of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes imposed to fund public schools. To the extent general law continues to require the deposit of that revenue in that manner and limit the appropriation of that revenue to that purpose, the requirement and limitation prevail over Subsection (a) of this section. SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to the Texas Constitution: TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state to the state highway fund. (b) The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by the amendment take effect September 1, 2026. (c) Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on September 1, 2026, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue to which Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution. (d) In each state fiscal year that begins on or after September 1, 2017, but before September 1, 2026, the legislature shall decrease in equal increments each year the amount of revenue to which Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies that is appropriated for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution as necessary to comply with Subsection (c) of this temporary provision beginning September 1, 2026. (e) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2027. SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue derived from the tax imposed on a sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state to the state highway fund."