1 | | - | By: Geren, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.J.R. No. 73 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Natural Resources and Economic Development; April 30, 2015, |
---|
5 | | - | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; |
---|
6 | | - | April 30, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.J.R. No. 73 |
---|
24 | 5 | | proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature |
---|
25 | 6 | | to permit professional sports team charitable foundations to |
---|
26 | 7 | | conduct charitable raffles. |
---|
27 | 8 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
28 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 47, Article III, Texas Constitution, is |
---|
29 | 10 | | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d-1) to |
---|
30 | 11 | | read as follows: |
---|
31 | 12 | | (a) The Legislature shall pass laws prohibiting lotteries |
---|
32 | 13 | | and gift enterprises in this State other than those authorized by |
---|
33 | 14 | | Subsections (b), (d), (d-1), and (e) of this section. |
---|
34 | 15 | | (d-1) The legislature by general law may permit a |
---|
35 | 16 | | professional sports team charitable foundation to conduct |
---|
36 | 17 | | charitable raffles under the terms and conditions imposed by |
---|
37 | 18 | | general law. The law may authorize the charitable foundation to pay |
---|
38 | 19 | | with the raffle proceeds reasonable advertising, promotional, and |
---|
39 | 20 | | administrative expenses. A law enacted under this subsection may |
---|
40 | 21 | | apply only to an entity that is defined as a professional sports |
---|
41 | 22 | | team charitable foundation on January 1, 2016, and may only allow |
---|
42 | 23 | | charitable raffles to be conducted at games hosted at the home venue |
---|
43 | 24 | | of the professional sports team associated with a professional |
---|
44 | 25 | | sports team charitable foundation. |
---|
45 | 26 | | SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
46 | 27 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. |
---|
47 | 28 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
48 | 29 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the |
---|
49 | 30 | | legislature to permit professional sports team charitable |
---|
50 | 31 | | foundations to conduct charitable raffles." |
---|
51 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 32 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 33 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 34 | + | I certify that H.J.R. No. 73 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 35 | + | 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 9, 2 present, not |
---|
| 36 | + | voting. |
---|
| 37 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 38 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 39 | + | I certify that H.J.R. No. 73 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 40 | + | 6, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4. |
---|
| 41 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 42 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 43 | + | RECEIVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 44 | + | Date |
---|
| 45 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | Secretary of State |
---|