Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR73 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.J.R. No. 73
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; April 30, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 April 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 FraserX
 EstesX
 BirdwellX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HinojosaX
 LucioX
 NicholsX
 SeligerX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to permit professional sports team charitable foundations to
 conduct charitable raffles.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislature shall pass laws prohibiting lotteries
 and gift enterprises in this State other than those authorized by
 Subsections (b), (d), (d-1), and (e) of this section.
 (d-1)  The legislature by general law may permit a
 professional sports team charitable foundation to conduct
 charitable raffles under the terms and conditions imposed by
 general law.  The law may authorize the charitable foundation to pay
 with the raffle proceeds reasonable advertising, promotional, and
 administrative expenses. A law enacted under this subsection may
 apply only to an entity that is defined as a professional sports
 team charitable foundation on January 1, 2016, and may only allow
 charitable raffles to be conducted at games hosted at the home venue
 of the professional sports team associated with a professional
 sports team charitable foundation.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to permit professional sports team charitable
 foundations to conduct charitable raffles."
 * * * * *