Senate | 05/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1943 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1846 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1615 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3451 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1084 | Journal Page: 3451 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3451 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3448 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | 10-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 3447 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 8-Lucio | Journal Page: 3446 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Nevrez and Flynn | Journal Page: 3441 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 527 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 527 | |
House | 02/03/2015 | Filed |