House | 05/08/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2815 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2815 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 307 | |
House | 12/11/2014 | Filed |