H.R. No. 1223 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Maria Elena and Arnoldo Alaniz are fondly remembered by the residents of Benavides for the many professional and civic contributions they made over the course of their lives; and WHEREAS, Born in Benavides on March 27, 1936, to Lazaro and Nicolasa Chapa, the former Maria Elena Chapa graduated from Benavides High School in 1955 and went on to earn both a bachelor's degree and a master's degree in education from Texas A&I University; and WHEREAS, Arnoldo Valerio Alaniz was born on December 30, 1931, and he also graduated from Benavides High School, where he was an all-district football player; following his service with the United States Army during the Korean War, he attended Texas A&I, receiving a bachelor's degree and a master's degree in math; and WHEREAS, The couple married in 1956 and shared 35 years together; they were blessed with three children, Arnoldo, Jaime, and Norma, and their family eventually grew to include five grandchildren, Amanda, Arnoldo, Matthew, Isabella, and Fabian, as well as a great-granddaughter, Katherine; and WHEREAS, Prominent members of their community, Mr. and Mrs. Alaniz enjoyed long and rewarding careers with the Benavides Independent School District; Mrs. Alaniz taught for more than three decades, and Mr. Alaniz worked as a teacher and a principal for 37 years; he also served as president of the Texas State Teachers Association; and WHEREAS, Mrs. Alaniz further distinguished herself as a member of the Benavides City Council for 19 years; devoted to her faith, she belonged to the Catholic Daughters of the Americas, and she and her husband were both valued parishioners of Santa Rosa de Lima Catholic Church; and WHEREAS, Although Mrs. Alaniz passed away on December 27, 2014, and Mr. Alaniz died on February 3, 1991, their efforts in behalf of their students and the city that they loved will continue to resonate for years to come; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives and achievements of Maria Elena and Arnoldo Alaniz. Guillen Straus González Paddie Straus González Paddie Straus González Paddie Allen Guerra Parker Allen Guerra Parker Allen Guerra Parker Alonzo Guillen Paul Alonzo Guillen Paul Alonzo Guillen Paul Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Anchia Harless Phelan Anchia Harless Phelan Anchia Harless Phelan Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Ashby Howard Price Ashby Howard Price Ashby Howard Price Aycock Huberty Raney Aycock Huberty Raney Aycock Huberty Raney Bell Hughes Raymond Bell Hughes Raymond Bell Hughes Raymond Bernal Hunter Reynolds Bernal Hunter Reynolds Bernal Hunter Reynolds Blanco Isaac Riddle Blanco Isaac Riddle Blanco Isaac Riddle Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burns Keough Rose Burns Keough Rose Burns Keough Rose Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Button King of Parker Schaefer Button King of Parker Schaefer Button King of Parker Schaefer Canales King of Taylor Schofield Canales King of Taylor Schofield Canales King of Taylor Schofield Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Clardy Klick Shaheen Clardy Klick Shaheen Clardy Klick Shaheen Coleman Koop Sheets Coleman Koop Sheets Coleman Koop Sheets Collier Krause Sheffield Collier Krause Sheffield Collier Krause Sheffield Cook Kuempel Simmons Cook Kuempel Simmons Cook Kuempel Simmons Craddick Landgraf Simpson Craddick Landgraf Simpson Craddick Landgraf Simpson Crownover Larson Smith Crownover Larson Smith Crownover Larson Smith Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Dale Leach Spitzer Dale Leach Spitzer Dale Leach Spitzer Darby Longoria Springer Darby Longoria Springer Darby Longoria Springer Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Farias Miles VanDeaver Farias Miles VanDeaver Farias Miles VanDeaver Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Fletcher Moody Walle Fletcher Moody Walle Fletcher Moody Walle Flynn Morrison White of Bell Flynn Morrison White of Bell Flynn Morrison White of Bell Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frullo Murphy Workman Frullo Murphy Workman Frullo Murphy Workman Galindo Murr Wray Galindo Murr Wray Galindo Murr Wray Geren Naishtat Wu Geren Naishtat Wu Geren Naishtat Wu Giddings Nevárez Zedler Giddings Nevárez Zedler Giddings Nevárez Zedler Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Gonzales Otto Gonzales Otto Gonzales Otto ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1223 was adopted by the House on March 26, 2015, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Straus González Paddie Allen Guerra Parker Alonzo Guillen Paul Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Anchia Harless Phelan Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Ashby Howard Price Aycock Huberty Raney Bell Hughes Raymond Bernal Hunter Reynolds Blanco Isaac Riddle Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burns Keough Rose Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Button King of Parker Schaefer Canales King of Taylor Schofield Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Clardy Klick Shaheen Coleman Koop Sheets Collier Krause Sheffield Cook Kuempel Simmons Craddick Landgraf Simpson Crownover Larson Smith Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Dale Leach Spitzer Darby Longoria Springer Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Farias Miles VanDeaver Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Fletcher Moody Walle Flynn Morrison White of Bell Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frullo Murphy Workman Galindo Murr Wray Geren Naishtat Wu Giddings Nevárez Zedler Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Gonzales Otto