House | 03/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 990 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 990 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 947 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Filed |