Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR141 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 141


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of John
 James Ellison of Brady, who passed away on December 24, 2014, at the
 age of 76; and
 WHEREAS, Jim Ellison was born in Brady on August 31, 1938, to
 William and Wynonna Ellison; a lifelong resident of McCulloch
 County, he was elected to represent Precinct 3 on the county
 commissioners court in 2013 and proudly served his community until
 the end of his life; he and his fellow commissioners were
 responsible for managing the construction and maintenance of county
 roads and bridges and for ensuring the availability of county
 services to all residents through the adoption of an appropriate
 budget and tax rate; and
 WHEREAS, On December 4, 1970, Jim Ellison married the love of
 his life, the former Scarlett Annita Bennett, and the couple shared
 a rewarding union that spanned 44 years, until his passing;
 Mr. Ellison was the proud father of three sons, Scott, Dean, and
 Casey, and he was further blessed with three beloved
 granddaughters; and
 WHEREAS, In January 2011, Jim and Nita Ellison celebrated the
 opening of their new business, Heart of Texas Pet Grooming in Brady;
 an avid outdoorsman, Mr. Ellison loved to hunt, fish, and watch
 horse races; he also enjoyed dancing with his wife and playing poker
 with his friends; above all else, he cherished the time he was able
 to spend with his family; and
 WHEREAS, Jim Ellison left an indelible impression on all who
 were blessed to know him, and those who shared in the warmth of his
 friendship and affection will forever hold him close in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Jim Ellison and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Nita
 Ellison; to his sons and daughters-in-law, Dean and Sandra Ellison
 and Casey and Brandy Ellison; to his granddaughters, Paris,
 Sterling, and Lacey Ellison; to his brother, Terry Ellison; to his
 cousins, Woody Pennington, Jeff Pennington, Ricky Pennington, Mark
 Adams, Billy Adams, and Tony Groves; and to his other relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of John James
 Ellison.
 Sheffield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 141 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 19, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House