House | 05/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1214 | Journal Page: 3828 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3828 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3828 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3828 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed |