House | 04/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1487 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Filed |