House | 04/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed |