House | 04/30/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1704 | |
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed |