Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1730 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1730


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The death of Lane Patrick Frizzell of Abilene on
 March 9, 2015, at the age of 63, brought a great loss to his family
 and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Angelo on September 5, 1951, Lane
 Frizzell was the son of Jack and Pat Frizzell; he graduated from
 Abilene High School and attended the University of Colorado before
 embarking on a backpacking trip through the Andes Mountains in
 South America; he completed his degree in business at Texas Tech
 University in 1974 and joined the family firm, Enrich Oil
 Corporation; he was responsible for the company's field operations,
 where his working knowledge of Spanish was an asset; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Frizzell married his high school sweetheart,
 the former Miriam Holly Lutz, on June 14, 1975; they became the
 proud parents of a son, Matthew, and a daughter, Jennifer; with his
 trove of stories, Mr. Frizzell helped broaden their horizons and
 those of other young people, and through the years, his children
 often heard their friends joke that their dad was the cool one in
 the family; and
 WHEREAS, A talented musician, Mr. Frizzell began playing in
 bands in junior high, and he was active on the local scene for many
 years as the leader of the popular group Slim Chance and the
 Survivors; he continued to enjoy travel, and later in life, he
 visited several Central and South American countries as a speaker
 on a Rotary International business exchange trip; in addition, he
 was a longtime member of the board of the YMCA; and
 WHEREAS, Lane Frizzell was a kind and caring gentleman, and
 although he will be deeply missed, those who were privileged to
 share in the richness of his life will forever treasure their
 memories of time spent in his company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Lane Frizzell and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Holly Frizzell; to his children, Matthew Frizzell and his wife,
 Clare, and Jennifer Frizzell and her fiance, Raul Garcia; to his
 grandson, Quentin Garcia; to his parents, Jack and Pat Frizzell; to
 his brother, Allan Frizzell, and his wife, Linda; to his sister,
 Joni Wood, and her husband, Bill; to his nieces and nephews,
 Hieromonk Alexander Frizzell, Jill Flores and her husband, Chano,
 and Britni, Nicholas, and Kelsey Wood; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Lane
 Frizzell.
 King of Taylor
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1730 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 7, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House