Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1768 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1768


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot express the sense of loss felt by the
 Gutierrez family of Robstown as they mourn the death of Guadalupe
 Benavidez Gutierrez on February 12, 2015, at the age of 69, and the
 death of her son, Manuel Gutierrez Jr., on March 14, at the age of
 45; and
 WHEREAS, Guadalupe Gutierrez was born in Robstown on
 September 16, 1945, to Roman and Irene Benavidez; she was joined in
 matrimony to Manuel Gutierrez Sr. for 47 years, and she was the
 proud mother of Manuel Jr. and Monica; she was also blessed with two
 grandchildren, John and Madelyn; a woman of strong religious faith,
 she sang with the El Rocio choir at St. Anthony's Catholic Church;
 and
 WHEREAS, Manuel Gutierrez Jr. was born to Manuel and
 Guadalupe Gutierrez in Corpus Christi on December 21, 1969; as
 "Little Manny G," he was a popular disc jockey at Magic 104.9, a
 Tejano radio station, where listeners particularly delighted in
 hearing his movie reviews on the air; when he wasn't working, he
 enjoyed spending time at the Corpus Christi Athletic Club; and
 WHEREAS, The loss of this beloved mother and son is a great
 hardship for their family, but those they have left behind may take
 comfort in knowing how deep was the affection and respect they
 enjoyed in life from all who knew them; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Guadalupe Benavidez
 Gutierrez and Manuel Gutierrez Jr. and extend sincere condolences
 to the members of their family: to Manuel Gutierrez Sr., Monica
 Gutierrez, John Angel Herrera, Madelyn Marie Nerio, and Teresa
 Garza; and to their other relatives and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Guadalupe
 Benavidez Gutierrez and Manuel Gutierrez Jr.
 Herrero
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1768 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 7, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House