Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR179 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 179


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories
 of Teresa de Jesus Flores Solis, who passed away on April 24, 2014,
 at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, Teresa Solis was born on October 15, 1928, and
 raised in Laredo, where she attended Guadalupe Catholic School,
 Christian Middle School, and Martin High School; an illness
 prevented her from completing her studies, so she entered the
 workforce early; and
 WHEREAS, On November 7, 1951, she married Juan Manuel Solis;
 the couple were blessed with 11 children, Juanita, Diana, Sylvia
 Nora, Elia, Virginia, Manuel de Jesus, Javier, Juan Gerardo,
 Adriana, Sandra, and Ruben; and
 WHEREAS, After raising her children, Mrs. Solis returned to
 school and received her GED from Laredo Community College at 53
 years of age; she had a desire to help others, particularly young
 people, so she went to work at a children's learning center with the
 City of Laredo Community Development program in 1972; she retired
 in 1992 in order to spend more time with her grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, A loving wife and mother and a superb chef,
 Mrs. Solis always had room for more loved ones around the table at
 "Guela's house," as her grandchildren called it, and was
 continually ready with a hot mug of atole or cafecito and sweets
 such as capirotada and pan dulce; in addition, she loved to dance
 and enjoyed attending weddings, quinceañeras, reunions, and other
 parties; she is remembered as a woman of steady faith and great
 strength, full of light and laughter and compassion for others; and
 WHEREAS, Teresa de Jesus Flores Solis lived a caring and
 purposeful life; she treasured the time she spent in the company of
 family and friends, and she is deeply missed by all those who held
 her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby honor the memory of Teresa de Jesus Flores Solis
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 children, Juanita Soliz and her husband, Joseph, Sylvia N. Brewster
 and her husband, Sam, Elia Rios and her husband, Orlando, Manuel de
 Jesus Solis and his wife, Martha, Javier Solis and his wife, Elena,
 Juan Gerardo Solis, Adriana Degollado and her husband, Enrique,
 Sandra Solis, and Ruben Solis and his wife, Marina; to her 25
 grandchildren and 15 great-grandchildren; and to her many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Teresa de
 Jesus Flores Solis.
 Wu
 Straus González Paddie Straus González Paddie
Straus González Paddie
 Allen Guerra Parker Allen Guerra Parker
Allen Guerra Parker
 Alonzo Guillen Paul Alonzo Guillen Paul
Alonzo Guillen Paul
 Alvarado Gutierrez Peña Alvarado Gutierrez Peña
Alvarado Gutierrez Peña
 Anchia Harless Phelan Anchia Harless Phelan
Anchia Harless Phelan
 Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips
Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips
 Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett
Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett
 Ashby Howard Price Ashby Howard Price
Ashby Howard Price
 Aycock Huberty Raney Aycock Huberty Raney
Aycock Huberty Raney
 Bell Hughes Raymond Bell Hughes Raymond
Bell Hughes Raymond
 Bernal Hunter Reynolds Bernal Hunter Reynolds
Bernal Hunter Reynolds
 Blanco Isaac Riddle Blanco Isaac Riddle
Blanco Isaac Riddle
 Bohac Israel Rinaldi Bohac Israel Rinaldi
Bohac Israel Rinaldi
 Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar
Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar
 Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis
Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis
 Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr. Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.
Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.
 Burns Keough Rose Burns Keough Rose
Burns Keough Rose
 Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford
Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford
 Button King of Parker Schaefer Button King of Parker Schaefer
Button King of Parker Schaefer
 Canales King of Taylor Schofield Canales King of Taylor Schofield
Canales King of Taylor Schofield
 Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert
Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert
 Clardy Klick Shaheen Clardy Klick Shaheen
Clardy Klick Shaheen
 Coleman Koop Sheets Coleman Koop Sheets
Coleman Koop Sheets
 Collier Krause Sheffield Collier Krause Sheffield
Collier Krause Sheffield
 Cook Kuempel Simmons Cook Kuempel Simmons
Cook Kuempel Simmons
 Craddick Landgraf Simpson Craddick Landgraf Simpson
Craddick Landgraf Simpson
 Crownover Larson Smith Crownover Larson Smith
Crownover Larson Smith
 Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee
Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee
 Dale Leach Spitzer Dale Leach Spitzer
Dale Leach Spitzer
 Darby Longoria Springer Darby Longoria Springer
Darby Longoria Springer
 Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson
Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson
 Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland
Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland
 Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria
Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria
 Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris
Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris
 Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt
Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt
 Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin
Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin
 Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris
Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris
 Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant
Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant
 Farias Miles VanDeaver Farias Miles VanDeaver
Farias Miles VanDeaver
 Farney Miller of Comal Villalba Farney Miller of Comal Villalba
Farney Miller of Comal Villalba
 Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo
Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo
 Fletcher Moody Walle Fletcher Moody Walle
Fletcher Moody Walle
 Flynn Morrison White of Bell Flynn Morrison White of Bell
Flynn Morrison White of Bell
 Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler
 Frullo Murphy Workman Frullo Murphy Workman
Frullo Murphy Workman
 Galindo Murr Wray Galindo Murr Wray
Galindo Murr Wray
 Geren Naishtat Wu Geren Naishtat Wu
Geren Naishtat Wu
 Giddings Nevárez Zedler Giddings Nevárez Zedler
Giddings Nevárez Zedler
 Goldman Oliveira Zerwas Goldman Oliveira Zerwas
Goldman Oliveira Zerwas
 Gonzales Otto Gonzales Otto
Gonzales Otto
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 179 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on February 19, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus González Paddie

Allen Guerra Parker

Alonzo Guillen Paul

Alvarado Gutierrez Peña

Anchia Harless Phelan

Anderson of Dallas Hernandez Phillips

Anderson of McLennan Herrero Pickett

Ashby Howard Price

Aycock Huberty Raney

Bell Hughes Raymond

Bernal Hunter Reynolds

Blanco Isaac Riddle

Bohac Israel Rinaldi

Bonnen of Brazoria Johnson Rodriguez of Bexar

Bonnen of Galveston Kacal Rodriguez of Travis

Burkett Keffer Romero, Jr.

Burns Keough Rose

Burrows King of Hemphill Sanford

Button King of Parker Schaefer

Canales King of Taylor Schofield

Capriglione King of Uvalde Schubert

Clardy Klick Shaheen

Coleman Koop Sheets

Collier Krause Sheffield

Cook Kuempel Simmons

Craddick Landgraf Simpson

Crownover Larson Smith

Cyrier Laubenberg Smithee

Dale Leach Spitzer

Darby Longoria Springer

Davis of Dallas Lozano Stephenson

Davis of Harris Lucio III Stickland

Deshotel Márquez Thompson of Brazoria

Dukes Martinez Thompson of Harris

Dutton Martinez Fischer Tinderholt

Elkins McClendon Turner of Collin

Faircloth Metcalf Turner of Harris

Fallon Meyer Turner of Tarrant

Farias Miles VanDeaver

Farney Miller of Comal Villalba

Farrar Miller of Fort Bend Vo

Fletcher Moody Walle

Flynn Morrison White of Bell

Frank Muñoz, Jr. White of Tyler

Frullo Murphy Workman

Galindo Murr Wray

Geren Naishtat Wu

Giddings Nevárez Zedler

Goldman Oliveira Zerwas

Gonzales Otto