House | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2558 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Filed |