Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2147 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2147


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Bobby Gerald Gillis of Sulphur Springs on June 27, 2013,
 at the age of 81; and
 WHEREAS, Bobby Gillis was born in Cumby on November 24, 1931,
 to Aura Kyle and Ruth Marie Gillis; on February 2, 1959, he married
 the former Janelle Gill; the couple enjoyed 54 loving years
 together and were blessed with a son, John; and
 WHEREAS, After serving in the United States Army, Mr. Gillis
 had a notable career as a highway contractor and businessman; he
 worked with his family's company, A. K. Gillis & Sons, for more than
 60 years, and he was a valued member of the Texas Good Roads and
 Transportation Association; and
 WHEREAS, Although Bobby Gillis is deeply missed, cherished
 memories of time spent in his company will long endure in the hearts
 of his many loved ones; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Bobby Gerald Gillis
 and extend sincere condolences to his relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Bobby
 Gillis.
 Flynn
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2147 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House