Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2262 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2262


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A devoted couple whose lives were enhanced by a
 great and enduring love, Helen and Manuel Chapa left this world only
 nine days apart after 72 rewarding years together; and
 WHEREAS, Residents of Corpus Christi, Mr. and Mrs. Chapa
 raised a loving family that included their children, Mary, Edward,
 Manuel, and Susie, and they were further blessed with the affection
 of 10 grandchildren, 24 great-grandchildren, and 2
 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Helen Chapa was born on August 18, 1927, in
 Brownsville to Audelio Olivares and Susana Garza; kind and
 compassionate, she worked as a nurse at Memorial Hospital in
 addition to caring for her loved ones; she passed away on April 1,
 2015, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born on October 30, 1923, Manuel Chapa served his
 country in the United States Army during World War II and went on to
 forge a successful career as an 18-wheeler driver and instructor;
 he found fulfillment in providing for his growing family, and he
 served as a role model to them by abiding by his two guiding
 principles, to never judge others and to always help those in need;
 Mr. Chapa passed away on April 10, 2015, at the age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout their seven decades of marriage, Mr. and
 Mrs. Chapa set an inspiring example of dedication to their family
 and to each other, and they will forever be remembered with
 tenderness and admiration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Manuel and Helen
 Chapa and extend sincere condolences to the members of their
 family: to their children, Mary Helen Beck and her husband, Terry,
 Edward Chapa and his wife, Vivian, and Manuel Chapa Jr. and his
 wife, Tamy; to their grandchildren, great-grandchildren, and
 great-great-grandchildren; to Mrs. Chapa's siblings, Eddie
 Olivares and his wife, Emilie, Rosemarie Torres and her husband,
 Tony, Alice Scott and her husband, Robert, Cecilia Wood, and Rudy
 Olivares; and to their other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Helen and
 Manuel Chapa.
 Herrero
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2262 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House