Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2294 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2294


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The family and friends of Ethel Mae Wolfe of Houston
 are mourning the passing of this beloved woman on January 20, 2014,
 at the age of 66; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Ogden, Utah, on June 9, 1947, to Bonnie and
 Leroy Haddock, Mrs. Wolfe grew up in Northwest Tennessee; inspired
 by her uncle, a minister, she graduated from the University of
 Tennessee and went on to earn two master's degrees from
 Southwestern Baptist Theological Seminary in Fort Worth; and
 WHEREAS, After moving to Houston, Mrs. Wolfe found
 employment as the assistant director of the Fletcher Street Mission
 Center; over the years, she also worked for the food stamp office
 and for child welfare and child protective services, managed her
 husband's CPA and law offices, and served as a youth counselor; she
 concluded her career as an 11th-grade English teacher at Lamar High
 School and as an elected trustee for the Cypress-Fairbanks
 Independent School District; and
 WHEREAS, The former Ethel Haddock married Bob Wolfe on
 December 21, 1974, and they became the proud parents of two sons,
 Michael and Jeffrey; Mrs. Wolfe cherished the time she spent with
 her children and with her two beloved granddaughters, Loryn and
 Addisyn; and
 WHEREAS, Ethel Wolfe's days were rich in family, friends, and
 meaningful achievements, and those who were blessed to share in her
 love and affection will forever hold her close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Ethel Mae Wolfe and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her sons,
 Michael and Jeffrey; to her granddaughters, Loryn and Addisyn; to
 her sister, Gloria; to her brother, Leroy; and to her other
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the members of her family and that when the Texas House
 of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ethel
 Mae Wolfe.
 Bohac
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2294 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House