House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3790 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3790 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2668 | |
House | 05/03/2015 | Filed |