House | 03/01/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 02/26/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Filed |