Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2904 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2904


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the sorrow felt at
 the tragic loss on September 27, 2013, of three beloved members of
 the Borger community, Charles Edward Washburn Jr., 91, his wife,
 Vonnie Washburn, 87, and their daughter, Cheryl Anne Dacus, 56; and
 WHEREAS, Caring parents and grandparents, Mr. and
 Mrs. Washburn nurtured a loving family that included their 4
 children, 11 grandchildren, and 8 great-grandchildren; together
 with their daughter, they drew inspiration from their strong
 religious faith and were valued members of the First Baptist Church
 of Borger; and
 WHEREAS, Chuck Washburn was born in Foard on May 31, 1922, to
 Charles and Irene Washburn; he answered his country's call to duty
 during World War II, serving in the navy with the 4th Special
 Battalion of the Seabees, and went on to enjoy a career as a
 supervisor with Phillips Petroleum Company; and
 WHEREAS, The former Vonnie Williamson, affectionately known
 as "Bess," was born to Vaughn and Nan Williamson on March 1, 1926,
 in Haskell County; a member of the Borger Music Club, she played
 piano and organ in churches from an early age, and she further
 contributed to her community as an election judge; and
 WHEREAS, The former Cheryl Anne Washburn was born on August
 5, 1957, in Borger; she served as the co-owner of Dakes Catering in
 Borger and was also a past president of the Borger Music Club and a
 member of the Boomtown Theater; she was involved in her church as a
 nursery worker, Sunday school teacher, children's choir director,
 and vacation Bible school organizer, and in addition, she coached
 softball and taught swimming lessons; devoted to her husband,
 David, and her three children, Angela, Emily, and Damon, she
 delighted all who knew her with her radiant smile and irrepressible
 laughter; and
 WHEREAS, Dedicated to their faith, their family, and their
 community, these three remarkable Texans were a blessing in many
 lives, and they will forever be remembered with great tenderness
 and affection by all those who held them dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 84th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay special tribute to the memory of Charles
 Edward Washburn Jr., Vonnie Williamson Washburn, and Cheryl Anne
 Dacus and extend deepest condolences to the members of their
 family: to Mr. and Mrs. Washburn's children, Larry Washburn and his
 wife, Sandra, Terry Washburn and his wife, Ruthie, and Doug
 Washburn and his wife, Janie; to Mrs. Washburn's siblings, Gene,
 Frank, Doug, and Tom Williamson, Patsy Poynor, and Ruthie Bankston;
 to Mrs. Dacus's husband, David Dacus, and her children, Angela
 Wakefield and her husband, Sam, and Emily Rios and her husband,
 Jose; to Mrs. Dacus's grandchildren, Aralyn Wakefield, Sterling
 Dacus, and Eloria Wakefield; and to their other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Charles
 Edward Washburn Jr., Vonnie Williamson Washburn, and Cheryl Anne
 Dacus.
 Price
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2904 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 30, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House